This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2021 at 06:37:50 (UTC).

Bongiovanni v. 3M Company, The et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Bongiovanni filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salvatore Bongiovanni

Defendants

3M Company, The

Du Pont De Nemours Inc

UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

Tyco Fire Products LP

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

Chemguard Inc

National Foam Inc

EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Chemours Company FC LLC, The

Dowdupont Inc

Kidde-Fenwal Inc

Kidde PLC Inc

GE Interlogix Inc

United Technologies Corporation

Chubb Fire LTD

Corteva Inc

Dynax Corporation

Chemours Company, The

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary A Anderson

Attorney at Environmental Litigation Group PC

2160 7Th Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Gregory A Cade

Attorney at Environmental Litigation Group PC

2160 7Th Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Kevin B McKie

Attorney at Environmental Litigation Group PC

2160 7Th Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) Modified filed date on 7/7/2021 (sshe, ). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9941103.), filed by Salvatore Bongiovanni. Service due by 9/30/2021(sshe, ) Modified filed date on 7/7/2021 (sshe, ). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Bongiovanni v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1993-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern New York (sshe, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) Modified filed date on 7/7/2021 (sshe, ). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9941103.), filed by Salvatore Bongiovanni. Service due by 9/30/2021(sshe, ) Modified filed date on 7/7/2021 (sshe, ). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DowDuPont Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Corteva Inc is a litigant