This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2021 at 17:41:05 (UTC).

BONFELD v. OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 BONFELD filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-60001

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAY BONFELD

LEO BONFELD

Defendants

OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP

FIBREBOARD CORP

PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#2

#4

 

Docket Entries

08/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) (D0C NO. 9025) IS GRANTED. ANY VIABLE NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY-ONLY" DOCKET; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THESE CASES CLOSED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/27/2020 8/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE DOC 9027 IN 01-MD-875)(kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DOCKET ENTRIES FILED IN ORIGINATING DISTRICT MASSACHUSETTS (kp, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) filed by PLAINTIFFS. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1252 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF THE HEREIN LISTED MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/5/2020. 8/10/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE DOCKET NO. 9024 IN 01-MD-875)(kp, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less