Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 09:41:37 (UTC).

Bone v. Houston County et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Bone filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Houston County INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerusha T. Adams, Andrew L. Brasher and R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

Presiding Judges

Andrew L. Brasher

R. Austin Huffaker, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendants

J. Trawick

Houston County Commissioners

Judge Derrick

Valerie D. Judah

Public Defender Yarbrough

Officer Downs

Houston County District Attorney Office

Clay Wadworth

K. Moore

Roy Caine

Sgt. Watson

Eric Davis

Arthur Ross Medley

Henry D. Binford

S. King

Benjamin Lewis

Jennifer R. Stanley

Donald Valenza

Matthew C. Lamere

Lt. Jones

26 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER that on or before 1/13/2020, Plaintiff shall file with the court a current address and/or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action. The CLERK is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his last known mailing address. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/19/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff as directed.(dmn, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER that on or before 12/27/2019, Plaintiff shall file either the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a prison account statement from the account clerk at the Houston County Jail as further set out in the order or, if he does not seek in forma pauperis treatment, the $400 filing administrative fees. To aid the plaintiff in complying with this order, the CLERK is DIRECTED to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/9/2019. Copy with IFP form mailed to plaintiff as directed. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Larry K. Anderson, Henry D. Binford, Jack A. Blumenfield, James Brazier, Seth R. Brooks, Patrick Burgess, Roy Caine, Mark Chouqette, Randy Clifton, T. Cole, Mark Cover, Eric Davis, Judge Derrick, Officer Downs, Dustin Judd Fowler, Benjamin Freeman, Houston County, Houston County Commissioners, Houston County District Attorney Office, Lt. Jones, Patrick B. Jones, III, Valerie D. Judah, S. King, Matthew C. Lamere, Benjamin Lewis, Lt. Marsh, Sean McGee, Arthur Ross Medley, Judge Melendez, Judge Molten, K. Moore, Sgt. Peterson, R. Phillips, Major Raffany, Thomas S. Smith, III, Thomas S. Smith, Jason Smoak, Lt. Snells, Jennifer R. Stanley, John Steensland, III, J. Trawick, Donald Valenza, Clay Wadworth, Sgt. Watson, Public Defender Yarbrough, filed by Sylvester L. Bone.(djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) Copy of ORDER entered in 1:19cv909-WHA severing case and directing that a new civil action be opened for this plaintiff, as further set out in order. (djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; #5 Order to Show Cause sent to Sylvester L. Bone was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable. #4 Notice of Reassignment mailed to Sylvester L. Bone returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Attempted, Not Known, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that on or before 1/13/2020, Plaintiff shall file with the court a current address and/or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action. The CLERK is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his last known mailing address. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/19/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff as directed.(dmn, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable. #3 Order with Application for IFP form mailed to Sylvester L. Bone returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that on or before 12/27/2019, Plaintiff shall file either the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a prison account statement from the account clerk at the Houston County Jail as further set out in the order or, if he does not seek in forma pauperis treatment, the $400 filing administrative fees. To aid the plaintiff in complying with this order, the CLERK is DIRECTED to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/9/2019. Copy with IFP form mailed to plaintiff as directed. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sylvester L. Bone. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #2 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Larry K. Anderson, Henry D. Binford, Jack A. Blumenfield, James Brazier, Seth R. Brooks, Patrick Burgess, Roy Caine, Mark Chouqette, Randy Clifton, T. Cole, Mark Cover, Eric Davis, Judge Derrick, Officer Downs, Dustin Judd Fowler, Benjamin Freeman, Houston County, Houston County Commissioners, Houston County District Attorney Office, Lt. Jones, Patrick B. Jones, III, Valerie D. Judah, S. King, Matthew C. Lamere, Benjamin Lewis, Lt. Marsh, Sean McGee, Arthur Ross Medley, Judge Melendez, Judge Molten, K. Moore, Sgt. Peterson, R. Phillips, Major Raffany, Thomas S. Smith, III, Thomas S. Smith, Jason Smoak, Lt. Snells, Jennifer R. Stanley, John Steensland, III, J. Trawick, Donald Valenza, Clay Wadworth, Sgt. Watson, Public Defender Yarbrough, filed by Sylvester L. Bone.(djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Copy of ORDER entered in 1:19cv909-WHA severing case and directing that a new civil action be opened for this plaintiff, as further set out in order. (djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Houston County Commissioners is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston County District Attorney Office is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER is a litigant