This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:17:03 (UTC).

Bone et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Bone filed an Other lawsuit against Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A. Robinson and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02284

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abraham Mejia

Bradley Mace

Christy Zisser

Brad Getz

Janine Buckley

Elisa Bindus

Christine Sawyer

Jill Lanham

Nancy McAtee

Sherri Anderson

Cheryl Barr

Julie Hoffman

Patrick McDonald

Kelly Bone

Ada Darnell

Sarah Stroud

Penny Hopson

Simmons Chhamboni

Defendants

John Does 1 - 10

Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph S. Tusa

Attorney at Tusa, PC

Po Box 566

Southhold, NY 11971

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Y Shay Chanoine

Attorney at O'Melvenhy & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Hannah Y. Chanoine

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP - NY

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

23 #2

Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines

23 #1

Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order

#23

(#23) LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

22 #1

*Restricted*

#22

(#22) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00831. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

21 #1

Schedule A

#21

(#21) Certified Copy of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas are transferred to the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#20

(#20) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas are transferred to the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) COPY of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Originally filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#7

(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#6

(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

5 #1

HPN Sales summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 HPN Sales summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#1

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ***DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE*** LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) Modified on 6/14/2019 (gw). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00831. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case transferred to District of Kansas. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Certified Copy of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas are transferred to the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas are transferred to the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Stay all proceedings in light of the impending transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation #19 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/23/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in Light of Pending Transfer Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chanoine, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Chanoine, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Chanoine, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Chanoine, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Chanoine, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Chanoine) (Chanoine, Hannah Y) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv2225. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/5/2019. (Marino, Janine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COPY of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Originally filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 HPN Sales summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11189611 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. (Tusa, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.