This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 09:16:55 (UTC).

Bondurant v. AAA Insurance

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Bondurant filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AAA Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01929

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Bondurant

Defendants

AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company

AAA Insurance a foreign corporation licensed to conduct business in Colorado doing business as CSAA General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 July 2021. Consent Form due by 9/15/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/22/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon AAA Insurance on 06/24/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

1 #15

Exhibit C - CO SOS info

1 #14

Exhibit B - assessor info

1 #13

Exhibit A - Docket Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit A - Ex 3 to Complaint

1 #10

Exhibit A - Ex 1 to Complaint

1 #9

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service

1 #8

Exhibit A - Order re Petition to Amend

1 #7

Exhibit A - Petition to Amend proposed order

1 #6

Exhibit A - Petition to Amend

1 #5

Exhibit A - Initial Procedural Order

1 #4

Exhibit A - DRO

1 #2

Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30796. (Filing fee $ 402)., filed by AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - DRO, #5 Exhibit A - Initial Procedural Order, #6 Exhibit A - Petition to Amend, #7 Exhibit A - Petition to Amend proposed order, #8 Exhibit A - Order re Petition to Amend, #9 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #10 Exhibit A - Ex 1 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit A - Ex 2 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit A - Ex 3 to Complaint, #13 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #14 Exhibit B - assessor info, #15 Exhibit C - CO SOS info)(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant AAA Insurance All parties consent.. (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by AAA Insurance.(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #9 to D. Chadwick Calvert LLC,7354 S. Alton Way, Suite 203, Centennial, Colorado 80112. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 July 2021. Consent Form due by 9/15/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/22/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon AAA Insurance on 06/24/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against AAA Insurance, filed by Kenneth Bondurant.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number COX099723 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30796. (Filing fee $ 402)., filed by AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - DRO, #5 Exhibit A - Initial Procedural Order, #6 Exhibit A - Petition to Amend, #7 Exhibit A - Petition to Amend proposed order, #8 Exhibit A - Order re Petition to Amend, #9 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #10 Exhibit A - Ex 1 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit A - Ex 2 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit A - Ex 3 to Complaint, #13 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #14 Exhibit B - assessor info, #15 Exhibit C - CO SOS info)(Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Kirsten Wagner