This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:33:47 (UTC).

Bond v. Global Connections of Kansas, Inc., a/k/a Global Connections, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Bond filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Global Connections of Kansas, Inc , a/k/a Global Connections, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karla R. Spaulding, Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judges

Karla R. Spaulding

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eldon Bond

Defendants

Global Connections of Kansas, Inc., a/k/a Global Connections, Inc.

Global Connections of Kansas, Inc.

Global Connections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly De Arcangelis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, 16Th Floor

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

390 N Orange Ave, Ste 1285

Orlando, FL 32801

Amanda A. Simpson

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

390 N Orange Ave, Ste 1285

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eldon Bond. Related case(s): no (De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of consent to join by Eldon Bond . (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join for Eldon Bond, #2 Consent to Join for Amy Twitchell)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. On or before May 16, 2019, the Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/10/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Global Connections of Kansas, Inc., a/k/a Global Connections, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15151078) filed by Eldon Bond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

7 #1

Consent to Join for Eldon Bond

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Eldon Bond. (De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Global Connections of Kansas, Inc.. (Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

7 #2

Consent to Join for Amy Twitchell

8 #1

Consent to Join for June Letizia

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#15

(#15) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/13/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of consent to join by Eldon Bond . (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join for June Letizia)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/13/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Set deadlines for Global Connections of Kansas, Inc. Answer due by 5/16/2019. (BIA) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. On or before May 16, 2019, the Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/10/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Simpson on behalf of Global Connections of Kansas, Inc. (Simpson, Amanda) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Global Connections of Kansas, Inc.. (Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/25/19. (PKK) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Eldon Bond. (De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eldon Bond. Related case(s): no (De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of consent to join by Eldon Bond . (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join for June Letizia)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of consent to join by Eldon Bond . (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join for Eldon Bond, #2 Consent to Join for Amy Twitchell)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • (#6) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-338-Orl-37LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (ALL) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to Global Connections of Kansas, Inc.. (AC) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-338-Orl-37KRS. (SJB) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Global Connections of Kansas, Inc., a/k/a Global Connections, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15151078) filed by Eldon Bond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.