This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:48:12 (UTC).

Bonavitacola v. Ownes-Illinois, et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Bonavitacola filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Ownes-Illinois,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-60008

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rita Bonavitacola

Defendants

Inc. Owens-Illinois

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

KEENE CORPORATION

UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY

UNITED STATES MINERAL PRODUCTS COMPANY

FORTY-EIGHT INSULATIONS INC.

FIBREBOARD CORPORATION

PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORPORATION

EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC

SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORPORATION

H.K PORTER COMPANY, INC.

CELOTEX CORPORATION

NICOLET INDUSTRIES

EMPIRE-ACE INSULATION MANUFACTURING COMPANY

GAF CORPORATION

Inc. Carey Canada

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT J. BRADLEY

Defendant Attorneys

PETER J. RUBIN

LAWRENCE G. CETRULO

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

18 #18

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

18 #1

*Restricted*

#19

(#19) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a). (mbh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

10/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a). (mbh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:84-cv-03338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/1994

Docket(#21) Amended complaint by Rita Bonavitacola , (Answer due 3/14/94 for Spraycraft Corp., for Owens Corning Fiberg, for Owens-Illinois, Inc., for Owens-Illinois Glass, for Keene Corporation ) amending against Pittsburgh-Corning, Eagle Picher Indust., Southern Textile, H.K. Porter Co., Celotex Corporation, Nicolet Industries, Empire-Ace Insul., GAF Corporation, Carey Canada, Inc., National Gypsum, filed. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/1994)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/1994

Docket(#20) Notice of substitution by Rita Bonavitacola (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/1994)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/1994

Docket(#19) Plaintiff, Rita Bonavitacola, as Executrix of the Estate of Patrick J. Bonavitacola, Sr., suggests upon the record the death of Patrick J. Bonavitacola, Sr. during the pendancy of this action. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/1994)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/1993

DocketOrder of Judge Charles R. Weiner: motion to dismiss by Ritz Bonavitacola, Patrick J. Bonavitacola Sr. allowed dismissing action against party Spraycraft Corp. See MML #1, #2, document #6865. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/1993)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/1992

DocketJudge Charles R. Weiner. Order of Dismissal entered in MDL-875 on 9/18/92. "...cases are dismissed without prejudice..." See Document #6805 in MML 1, MML 2. Copies sent to Liaison Counsel. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/1993)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/1992

Docket(#18) Senior Judge Charles R. Weiner . Order granting [17-1] motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs be permitted to amend their complaint to reflect the addition of a claim for lung cancer, which was diagnosed after the filing of the original complaint. (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/1992)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/1992

Docket(#17) Motion by Patrick J Bonavitacola Sr, Ritz Bonavitacola for leave to file First Amended Complaint (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/1992)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/1991

DocketInterdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania, per July 29, 1991 transfer order of Multidistrict Litigation Panel in In Re: asbestos litigation (MDL-875). Case closed. (vah) Modified on 11/19/1991 [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/1991)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/1991

DocketMotion by Patrick J Bonavitacola Sr, Keene Corporation to dismiss Keene Corporation (SEE MML #1-5, #6684) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/1992)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/1991

DocketJudge Rya W. Zobel . Endorsed Order granting [0-1] motion to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/1993)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/1991

DocketMotion by Owens Corning Fiberg to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/1993)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/1991

DocketMotion by Patrick J Bonavitacola Sr, Ritz Bonavitacola, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Owens-Illinois Glass to dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc. and Owens-Illinois Glass Co (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6683) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/1992)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less