This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:32:53 (UTC).

Bonasera v. New River Electrical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Bonasera filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against New River Electrical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03817

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas J Bonasera

Defendants

New River Electrical Corporation

W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.

Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company

Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company doing business as Penn National Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott E. Smith

Attorney at Scott Elliot Smith LPA

5003 Horizons Drive, Suite 1Oo

Columbus, OH 43220

Brian Richard Noethlich

Attorney at Scott Elliot Smith LPA

5003 Horizons Drive, Suite 101

Columbus, OH 43220

Defendant Attorneys

Keith L Pryatel

Attorney at Kastner Westman & Wilkins LLC

3550 West Market Street, Suite 100

Akron, OH 44333

John W Hofstetter

Attorney at Kastner Westman & Wilkins, LLC

3550 West Market Street, Suite 100

Akron, OH 44333

D Patrick Kasson

Attorney at Reminger Co., LPA

200 South Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

Brandon Lee Abshier

Attorney at Reminger Co., L.P.A.

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

14 #2

Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Memo in Support of Mtn to Dismiss and Request for Oral A

14 #1

Exhibit Def.'s Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and Request for Ora

#14

(#14) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Oral Argument by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def.'s Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Memo in Support of Mtn to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument) (Pryatel, Keith) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/29/2019. by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#11

(#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The October 9, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2020. Motions to Amend due by 2/24/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 1/7/2020. Discovery (Fact) due by 10/5/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/19/2020. Primary Expert due by 6/17/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/27/2020. Settlement Demand due by 1/7/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/7/2020. Mediation Deadline: 4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/3/2019. (daf) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#10

(#10) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Abshier, Brandon) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas J Bonasera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibits A-E in Support of its Motion to Dismiss

5 #1

Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E in Support of its Motion to Dismiss) (Pryatel, Keith) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against New River Electrical Corporation, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, and W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc., filed by Thomas J Bonasera. (daf) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Hofstetter, John) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Oral Argument by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def.'s Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Memo in Support of Mtn to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument) (Pryatel, Keith) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Amended Complaint. W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. answer due 10/29/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/15/2019. (agm) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/29/2019. by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The October 9, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2020. Motions to Amend due by 2/24/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 1/7/2020. Discovery (Fact) due by 10/5/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/19/2020. Primary Expert due by 6/17/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/27/2020. Settlement Demand due by 1/7/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/7/2020. Mediation Deadline: 4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/3/2019. (daf) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Abshier, Brandon) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas J Bonasera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Smith, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E in Support of its Motion to Dismiss) (Pryatel, Keith) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset deadlines pursuant to #4 : Answers due 10/2/2019. (ew) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against New River Electrical Corporation, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, and W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc., filed by Thomas J Bonasera. (daf) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Hofstetter, John) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-CV-006347, filed by New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pryatel, Keith) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7091658 (kk2) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Elliot Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Richard Noethlich