Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2021 at 10:01:08 (UTC).

Bonafide Properties LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Bonafide Properties LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against The Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher P. Tuite, Mary S. Scriven and Kathryn K. Mizelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00752

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

Presiding Judges

Mary S. Scriven

Kathryn K. Mizelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonafide Properties LLC

Defendants

The Bank of New York Mellon

The Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee Segal

Attorney at Segal & Schuh Law Group, PL

18167 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Kirk Walker

Attorney at Akerman LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 3100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Katherine Elizabeth Shepard

Attorney at Akerman LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste. 1700

Tampa, FL 33602-5250

Heather Lynn Fesnak

Attorney at Akerman LLP - Tampa

401 E Jackson St Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602-5250

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), the Undersigned recuses from all further participation in this case. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/14/2021. (MWC) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#33

(#33) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Fesnak, Heather) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#32

(#32) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bonafide Properties LLC. (Segal, Lee) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#31

(#31) Amended NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bonafide Properties LLC. Related case(s): No (Segal, Lee) Modified on 4/12/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Shepard on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Shepard, Katherine) Modified on 4/1/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Fesnak on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Fesnak, Heather) Modified on 4/1/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

26 #1

*Restricted*

#26

(#26) Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00054. File received electronically (Entered: 03/29/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) NOTICE of BONY Annual Reports from 1995-2020 by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC. (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

Set Deadlines/Hearings RE #3 Order (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/19/2021). (replies within 7 days after responses are filed.) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WALKER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit D - NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

1 #3

Exhibit C - CORPORATE SEARCH

1 #2

Exhibit B - ALL STATE PLEADINGS

1 #1

Exhibit A - CHART CASES

#1

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#35) Case Reassigned to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle. New case number: 8:21-cv-752-KKM-CPT. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (JNB) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), the Undersigned recuses from all further participation in this case. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/14/2021. (MWC) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Fesnak, Heather) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bonafide Properties LLC. (Segal, Lee) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Amended NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bonafide Properties LLC. Related case(s): No (Segal, Lee) Modified on 4/12/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Shepard on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Shepard, Katherine) Modified on 4/1/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Fesnak on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Fesnak, Heather) Modified on 4/1/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket(#27) TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida (Panama City Division). Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New Case Number: 8:21-cv-752-MSS-CPT. (AG) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00054. File received electronically (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Cheryl Santucci Admitting Merger by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Darrin Mish by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of BONYM SEC Filings by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of BONY Annual Reports from 1995-2020 by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC. (SEGAL, LEE) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings RE #3 Order (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/19/2021). (replies within 7 days after responses are filed.) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to set aside the default, etc. (Doc. 1-2, at 51), and Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's motions for sanctions, etc. (id. at 108, 594) and requests for judicial notice (id. at 340, 343, 416). The parties may file replies within 7 days after the responses are filed. (PLEASE SEE ORDER.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/5/2021. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WALKER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON from FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, BAY COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 2020-CA-1738. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5973607.), filed by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CHART CASES, #2 Exhibit B - ALL STATE PLEADINGS, #3 Exhibit C - CORPORATE SEARCH, #4 Exhibit D - NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (WALKER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from flnd on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONAFIDE PROPERTIES LLC AS TRUSTEE ONLY, UNDER THE 13014 EARLY RUN LN LAND TRUST, WITH FULL POWER AND AUTHORITY TO PROTECT, CONSERVE,SELL,LEASE,ENCUMBER OR OTHERWISE MANAGE AND DISPOSE OF SAID PROPERTY PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 689.071 is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee Segal