This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:57:13 (UTC).

Bolton et al v. Wendelta Property Holdings L L C

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Bolton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wendelta Property Holdings L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00657

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

sundee Wilhite bolton

Tommy Ray Bolton

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance Co

Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC

Wendelta Property Holdings L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles H Heck

Attorney at Law Office of Charles H Heck

1900 N 18Th Ste 430

Monroe, LA 71201

Charles H Heck, Jr

Attorney at Heck Law Firm

1900 N 18Th St Ste 430

Monroe, LA 71201

Christian C Creed

Attorney at Creed & Creed

P O Drawer 14136

Monroe, LA 71207

Defendant Attorneys

Christian B Bogart

Attorney at Duplass Zwain et al

3838 N Causeway Blvd Ste 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

John Gerard Yadamec

Attorney at Duplass Zwain et al

3838 N Causeway Blvd Ste 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC for Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC. (aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #6

Certificate of Service of Removal to Adverse Party

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #5

Notice to the State Court of Filing Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings L L C.(aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC, Ouachita Parish, Case Number 20191127 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3956200) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Verification, #5 Notice to the State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service of Removal to Adverse Party, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Attorney John Gerard Yadamec added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Co(pty:selreq), Attorney John Gerard Yadamec added to party Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #4

Verification

#7

(#7) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/11/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC of Compliance (aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christian B Bogart, John Gerard Yadamec on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/6/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Counsel for parties shall show cause in writing by 7/26/2019 why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Civil Case Management Order. In addition, counsel are expected to file their Rule 26(f) Case Management Report immediately. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/12/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

1 #8

Notice of Removal to Adverse Party

1 #7

Proof of Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Counsel for parties shall show cause in writing by 7/26/2019 why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Civil Case Management Order. In addition, counsel are expected to file their Rule 26(f) Case Management Report immediately. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/12/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/11/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings L L C.(aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC for Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC. (aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christian B Bogart, John Gerard Yadamec on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/6/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC of Compliance (aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC, Ouachita Parish, Case Number 20191127 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3956200) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Verification, #5 Notice to the State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service of Removal to Adverse Party, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Attorney John Gerard Yadamec added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Co(pty:selreq), Attorney John Gerard Yadamec added to party Wendelta Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Yadamec, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.