6:22-CV-01193
11/16/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Labor Standard
Alan D Albright
Derek T. Gilliland
Kevan Boling
G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.
Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.
William Clifton Alexander
Alan Clifton Gordon
Austin W. Anderson
Carter T. Hastings
Lauren E. Braddy
Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
John Stuart Collins
Main Document
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kevan Boling. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc., Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
Main Document
Proposed Order
(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevan Boling. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/29/2022; Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc..(Collins, John) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. . Attorney Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul added to party G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (pty:dft) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2023)
Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. . Attorney Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul added to party G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. (pty:dft) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc..(Collins, John) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevan Boling. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/29/2022; Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc. served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketReset Deadlines: G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. answer due 12/29/2022. (lad) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketText Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or to file Responsive Pleading) entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or to file Responsive Pleading) by G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Collins, John) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc., Securitas Critical Infrastructure Services, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kevan Boling. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16764417), filed by Kevan Boling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
[-] Read Less