This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:56:44 (UTC).

Boldt v. Kassel et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Boldt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kassel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr, Paul Kohler and David Nuffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul Kohler

Presiding Judges

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inge Boldt

Defendants

Glenn Kassel

New Prime a Nebraska Limited Liability Company doing business as Prime

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John R. Berger

Attorney at SIEGFRIED & JENSEN

5664 S Green St

Salt Lake City, UT 84123

Mark R. Taylor

Attorney at SIEGFRIED & JENSEN

5664 S Green St

Salt Lake City, UT 84123

Defendant Attorneys

Peter H. Christensen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Kathryn Tunacik Smith

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendants Glenn Kassel, New Prime are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Glenn Kassel, New Prime. (mh) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Inge Boldt, Defendants Glenn Kassel, New Prime. (mh) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/20/22 (alt) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Taylor on behalf of Inge Boldt (Taylor, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Taylor on behalf of Inge Boldt (Taylor, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docket(#8) Case Reassigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Judge David Nuffer no longer assigned to the case as a result of Judge Nuffer's interim role as acting Chief Deputy Clerk. Magistrate Judge Referral is unaffected. Case number will now read 4:22-cv-00031-HCN-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#7) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/20/2022. (pjd) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/20/22 (alt) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Inge Boldt, Defendants Glenn Kassel, New Prime. (mh) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Glenn Kassel, New Prime. (mh) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial District Washington County, State of Utah, case number 220500009, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC4337217) filed by Glenn Kassel and New Prime. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Smith, Kathryn) Modified on 5/19/2022 to include New Prime as a filer (mh). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendants Glenn Kassel, New Prime are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H Christensen