This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2022 at 08:08:36 (UTC).

BOLDEN v. NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 BOLDEN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter G. Sheridan and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05070

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter G. Sheridan

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORREY BOLDEN

Defendant

NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID MIKEL KOLLER

Defendant Attorneys

ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU

KEITH J. ROSENBLATT

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC identifying NTT DATA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU on behalf of NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to Complaint. Attorney KEITH J. ROSENBLATT for NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC added. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC.(STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#7

(#7) Order Initial Conference set for 11/14/2022 09:30 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide parties with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/9/2022. (ijf, ) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Initial Conference set for 11/14/2022 09:30 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide parties with dial in information prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/9/2022. (ijf, ) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC.(STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/6/2022. (kht) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to Complaint. Attorney KEITH J. ROSENBLATT for NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC added. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketJudge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This case was mistakenly filed in Camden as 3:22-cv-5061. The case has been copied to Trenton and reassigned civil action no. 3:22-cv-5070. Any future filings should be filed in 3:22-cv-5070 . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANASTASIA ANNE STYLIANOU on behalf of NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC (STYLIANOU, ANASTASIA) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC identifying NTT DATA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number SOM-L-000500-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13629580), filed by NTT DATA SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less