This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:18:28 (UTC).

Bolden v. Lake County Board of Education

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Bolden filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lake County Board of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01262

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valecia Bolden

Tiptonville, TN 38079

Defendant

Lake County Board of Education

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Judge's Card

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 11/20/2019. (ars) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

2 #1

document from Dept of Human Services

1 #2

EEOC Right to Sue Letter

#8

(#8) ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Valecia Bolden. (mbm) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Valecia Bolden. (Attachments: #1 document from Dept of Human Services)(skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #1

Charge of Discrimination

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Valecia Bolden Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 12/11/2019. (ars) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Lake County Board of Education filed by Valecia Bolden. (Attachments: #1 Charge of Discrimination, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #3 Judge's Card)(skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Valecia Bolden. (mbm) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Valecia Bolden Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 12/11/2019. (ars) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 11/20/2019. (ars) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Valecia Bolden. (Attachments: #1 document from Dept of Human Services)(skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Lake County Board of Education filed by Valecia Bolden. (Attachments: #1 Charge of Discrimination, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #3 Judge's Card)(skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.