This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:45:39 (UTC).

Boland v. Sandoval County et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Boland filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sandoval County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea and Robert C. Brack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01109

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Brack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaron Boland

Defendants

Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.

Sandoval County

Victor Rodriguez

John and Jane Does 1 through 10

Sandoval County Board of Commissioners

John and Jane Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louren M Oliveros

Attorney at Gorence & Oliveros PC

300 Central Avenue Sw, Suite 1000E

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Robert J. Gorence

Attorney at Gorence & Oliveros PC

300 Central Avenue Sw, Suite 1000E

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Dickman

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Dickman

Po Box 549

Santa Fe, NM 87504

Alfred A Park

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Masthead St., N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Geoffrey D White

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Mashead St. N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners. (Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners, Sandoval County (Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners. (Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Aaron Boland. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (White, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

11 #7

Exhibit

11 #1

Exhibit

11 #2

Exhibit

11 #5

Exhibit

11 #6

Exhibit

11 #3

Exhibit

11 #4

Exhibit

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Aaron Boland. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Aaron Boland of Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Boland. Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Boland. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Boland. Sandoval County served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.. (White, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners, Sandoval County (Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners. (Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Aaron Boland. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Aaron Boland. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (White, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • (#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea FINDING good cause to delay entry of scheduling order. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court hereby finds good cause to delay holding a scheduling conference and entering a scheduling order until the Presiding Judge resolves the pending dispositive motion. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Aaron Boland of Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Boland. Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Boland. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Boland. Sandoval County served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Oliveros, Louren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.. (White, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, of Consent to Removal (White, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey D White on behalf of Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc. (White, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on Qualified Immunity by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of Commissioners. (Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6825154 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County, Sandoval County Board of County Comissioners (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County Board of County Comissioners, Sandoval County from State of New Mexico First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-02598. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Victor Rodriguez, Sandoval County Board of County Comissioners, Sandoval County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickman, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.