This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 08:34:43 (UTC).

Boland v. Amazon.com Sales, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Boland filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Amazon com Sales, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02579

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John C. Boland

Baltimore, MD 21210

Defendant

Amazon.com Sales, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick John Curran

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1301 K St Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

John A Goldmark

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104

Robert Edward Miller

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue Ste 3300

Seattle, WA 98004

Rose McCarty

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue Ste 3300

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc..(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

24 #2

Redline Version

24 #1

Amended Complaint

#24

(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by John C. Boland. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Redline Version)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by John C. Boland. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#22

(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Permission to Submit Evidentiary Memorandum and Expedite Discovery filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc..(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

18 #2

Envelope

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION for Permission to Submit Evidentiary Memorandum and Motion to Expedite Discovery by John C. Boland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

6 #2

Envelope

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Robert Miller Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration)(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Removal Notification Letter sent to John C. Boland. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.8.2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/8/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.8.2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Amazon.com Sales, Inc. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#2

(#7) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc..(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by John C. Boland. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Redline Version)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by John C. Boland. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Permission to Submit Evidentiary Memorandum and Expedite Discovery filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc..(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Denying as moot #6 Motion to Remand; granting #20 Motion to withdraw motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 11.3.2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to withdraw motion to remand by John C. Boland (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Robert Miller Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration)(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Permission to Submit Evidentiary Memorandum and Motion to Expedite Discovery by John C. Boland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John A Goldmark. Attorney John A Goldmark will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rose McCarty. Directing attorney Rose McCarty to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com Inc. for Amazon.com Sales, Inc..(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand by John C. Boland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Removal Notification Letter sent to John C. Boland. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.8.2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/8/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.8.2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeficiency Notice as to Amazon.com Sales, Inc.-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/15/2021 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Amazon.com Sales, Inc. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Sales, Inc., filed by John C. Boland.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-21-003724. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9538217), filed by Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.com Sales, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rose McCarty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Edward Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick John Curran, Jr.