Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 16:25:53 (UTC).

Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC v. Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Boland Marine Industrial, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Bouchard Transportation Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC

Defendant

Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.

Garnishees

Laurel Shipping LLC

PBF Energy Company LLC

Trafigura AG

Valero Refining and Marketing Company

Trafigura Trading

Delaware City Refining Company LLC

Valero Refining Company

PBF Energy, Inc.

PBF Energy Partners LP

Gulf Oil Limited Partnership

Gulf Oil Corporation

Apex Oil Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Jay Houseal

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#27

(#27) REQUEST for Default as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC as to Garnishees Valero Refining & Marketing Company and Valero Refining Company (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC as to Garnishees PBF Energy, Inc., PBF Energy Partners LP, PBF Energy Company LLC and Delaware City Refining Company LLC (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#24

(#24) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Bouchard Transportation Inc. c/o Morton S. Bouchard, III on 2/26/20, filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC as to Garnishees Gulf Oil Corporation and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment and Discovery on Garnishees by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

21 #1

Writ for Maritime Attachment and Garnishment as to Valero Marketing and Supply

#21

(#21) APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Writ for Maritime Attachment and Garnishment as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company)(Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Trafigura Trading - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Delaware City Refining Company LLC - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Laurel Shipping LLC - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Appointment for service of writ of maritime attachment and garnishment w/ proposed order - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for order for issuance of process of maritime attachment and garnishment w/ proposed order - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Letter to Clerk requesting expedited handling

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALTY- filed against Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2832250.) - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk requesting expedited handling, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REQUEST for Default as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC as to Garnishees Valero Refining & Marketing Company and Valero Refining Company (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC as to Garnishees PBF Energy, Inc., PBF Energy Partners LP, PBF Energy Company LLC and Delaware City Refining Company LLC (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Bouchard Transportation Inc. c/o Morton S. Bouchard, III on 2/26/20, filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC as to Garnishees Gulf Oil Corporation and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment and Discovery on Garnishees by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued - re #21 Application for Writ. (3 certified copies available for pick up in the Clerk's Office during normal business hours of 8:30 a.m.- 4:00 p.m.) (nmf) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Writ for Maritime Attachment and Garnishment as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company)(Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney J. Stephen Simms for Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Stephen Simms filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/31/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Trafigura AG -filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to PBF Energy, Inc. -filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Valero Refining and Marketing Company -filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Trafigura Trading - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Delaware City Refining Company LLC - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Laurel Shipping LLC - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Appointment for service of writ of maritime attachment and garnishment w/ proposed order - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for order for issuance of process of maritime attachment and garnishment w/ proposed order - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALTY- filed against Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2832250.) - filed by Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk requesting expedited handling, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PBF Energy Partners LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Apex Oil Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Laurel Shipping LLC is a litigant