This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 17:11:04 (UTC).

BOKOR v. THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 BOKOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is W. Scott Hardy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W. Scott Hardy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAIG BOKOR

Defendants

THE AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE

THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION

THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH

THE ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE

THE NCAA

THE BIG EAST CONFERENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Steven Berman

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC

One Greentree Center, Suite 201, 10,000 Lincoln Dr. East

Marlton, NJ 08053

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Baltruzak

Attorney at Jones Day - Pittsburgh

500 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Leon F. DeJulius

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street, One Mellon Center, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #3

Summons

#4

#5

#6

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER indicating that in light of the filing of #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/26/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CRAIG BOKOR (Berman, William) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Leon F. DeJulius on behalf of THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (DeJulius, Leon) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Baltruzak on behalf of THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Baltruzak, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJudge W. Scott Hardy added. (mao) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to another member of the Bench. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/16/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to THE AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE, THE ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jjg) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE, THE ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6336867), filed by CRAIG BOKOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NCAA is a litigant

Latest cases where THE AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE is a litigant