This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 12:18:23 (UTC).

Boileau et al v. Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Boileau filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Aleta A. Trauger, Alistair Newbern and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judges

Aleta A. Trauger

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendants

Sarah O'Connell

Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.

Thomas Murphy

Vincent Bambinelli

Melissa Ferrigno

Marc Hamburg

Ronald Olson

Charles Munger

American Express, Inc.

Sofia Bambinelli

Joseph Houston White

Charlotte Guyman

John and Jane Does

Warren Buffet

Richard Ferrigno

Peter Chernin

Gregory Abel

Howard Buffett

Gina Bambinelli

Ajit Jain

160 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

7 #1

Exhibit - Exhibits In Support

#6

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons issued as to Gregory Abel, American Express, Inc., Gina Bambinelli, Sofia Bambinelli, Vincent Bambinelli, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Warren Buffet, Howard Buffett, Peter Chernin, Susan Decker, Melissa Ferrigno, Richard Ferrigno, Vanessa Ferrigno, Charlotte Guyman, Marc Hamburg, Ajit Jain, Charles Munger, Tiffany Larkin Myers, Sarah O'Connell, Walter Scott, Joseph Houston White. Service copies returned to pro se parties by mail. In addition, the parties were mailed a copy of the docket sheet. (mg) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger recused. (Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/25/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RECEIPT #34675061779 in the amount of $402 posted by Kyle Joseph Boileau, Michael Tangredi Boileau re #1 Complaint. (mg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Boileau, Michael Boileau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibits In Support)(mg) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pro se Plaintiffs Kyle Joseph Boileau and Michael Tangredi Boileau have filed a motion to add defendants in this civil action (Doc. No. #4 ). The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If the plaintiffs wish to add parties to this action, they must do so by filing a motion to amend the complaint that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 and this Court's Local Rule 15.01 and includes an attached proposed amended pleading that contains all claims and defenses the plaintiffs intend to raise against all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/16/2021. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (mg) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Add Defendants by Kyle Joseph Boileau, Michael Tangredi Boileau. (bs) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on dispositive matters. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/8/2021. (xc: Pro se parties by regular mail.) (mg) Modified on 3/9/2021 (mg). (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Joseph Boileau, Michael Tangredi Boileau. (Fee Due.)(mg) Modified on 2/25/2021 (mg). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Berkshire Hathaway Automotive (Van AutoPlex) is a litigant