4:20-CV-07085
10/09/2020
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Personal Property Fraud
Kandis A. Westmore
JOHN BOHREN
Edith Marquez
Grocery Outlet, Inc.
Grocery Outlet Holding Corp
Pratik H Shah
Attorney at Shah D'Egidio, APC
7801 Mission Center Court, Suite 240
San Diego, CA 92108
Matthew Righetti
Attorney at Righetti Glugoski, P.C.
220 Halleck Street, Suite 220
San Francisco, CA 94129
John Glugoski
Attorney at Righetti Glugoski, P.C.
220 Halleck Street, Suite 220
San Francisco, CA 94129
Reuben D. Nathan
Attorney at Nathan & Associates, APC
2901 W. Coast Highway, Suite 200
Newport Beach, CA 92663
Stephanie Anne Sheridan, Esq.
Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP
One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3900
San Francisco, CA 94105-1409
Meegan Bay Brooks
Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP
One Market Street, Spear Tower, Suite 3900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Anthony John Anscombe
Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP
One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Certificate/Proof of Service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Proposed Order
Certificate/Proof of Service
EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF LUKE ESTEP
EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DORIAN BERTSCH
Proof of Service
Exhibit B
Exhibit A
Docket(#24) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Bohren, Edith Marquez (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by John Bohren, Edith Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Bohren, Edith Marquez re #21 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJohn Bohren, Edith Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Peter A. Morrison, #2 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DORIAN BERTSCH, #3 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF LUKE ESTEP, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #16 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 01:30 PM. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020) (Entered: 11/27/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) Renotice motion hearing re #16 DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Grocery Outlet Holding Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/25/2020) Modified on 11/27/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/25/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS filed by Grocery Outlet Holding Corp. and Grocery Outlet ,Inc. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE SHERIDAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS, #2 PROPOSED ORDER, #3 DECLARATION OF DORIAN BERTSCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO SEAL, #4 DECLARATION OF LUKE ESTEP IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO SEAL, #5 DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #6 DECLARATION OF DORIAN BERTSCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO SEAL, #7 DECLARATION OF LUKE ESTEP IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO SEAL, #8 DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #9 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/23/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/23/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) ORDER REQUIRING CHAMBERS COPIES. Pursuant to General Order 72-6, the courtesy copy requirement in the local rules is suspended pending further notice, unless a judge orders otherwise in a specific case. Accordingly, the filing party shall lodge a chambers copy of #16 DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, and related documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within 7 days of this order. Additionally, the parties shall provide tabbed, chambers copies of all papers filed in connection with this motion. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/19/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE. The Motion to Dismiss #16 is set for hearing on an unavailable date, therefore the hearing is vacated. Please re-notice (do not re-file) the motion for an available date after checking Judge Westmore's Scheduling Notes at www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) DEFENDANTS GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Grocery Outlet Holding Corp. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 12/2/2020. Replies due by 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/18/2020) Modified on 11/19/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Bohren.. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP... (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. identifying Other Affiliate GOBP Midco, Inc.,, Other Affiliate GOBP Holdings, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Globe Intermediate Corp.,, Other Affiliate Grocery Outlet Inc. for GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP.. AND GROCERY OUTLET INC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP., Grocery Outlet, Inc. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP., Grocery Outlet, Inc. . (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is HG20067521. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15048946). Filed byGrocery Outlet, Inc., GROCERY OUTLET HOLDING CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
[-] Read Less