This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2021 at 08:12:21 (UTC).

Bohman v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Bohman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Stanley Black Decker, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel M. Traynor and Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas H. Bohman

Defendant

Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Hager

Attorney at Pagel Hager PLLC

1715 Burnt Boat Drivemadison Suite

Bismarck, ND 58503

Defendant Attorneys

Russ Ponessa

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 South Seventh Streetste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Zachary E. Pelham

Attorney at Pearce Durick PLLC

314 East Thayer Avenuepo Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Kirsten H. Tuntland

Attorney at Pearce Durick PLLC

314 East Thayer Avenuepo Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Russell S. Ponessa (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2258876) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Ponessa, Russ) Modified to add receipt number on 9/10/2021 (pb). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. for Stanley Black & Decker, Inc... (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Thomas H. Bohman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hager, Scott) Modified to clarify attachment description on 10/12/2021 (pb). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Amended Complaint

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Scheduling Discovery Plan by Thomas H. Bohman. (Hager, Scott) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 10/6/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2022. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/15/2022. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/15/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 10/10/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 1/1/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2022. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/16/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2022.(LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/1/2022 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (BG) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (BG) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/1/2022 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (4 days). (LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 10/6/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2022. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/15/2022. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/15/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 10/10/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 1/1/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2022. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/16/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2022.(LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#10) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2021. (LC) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 MOTION for Leave to File. Clerk's Office clarified attachment description. (pb) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Scheduling Discovery Plan by Thomas H. Bohman. (Hager, Scott) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Thomas H. Bohman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hager, Scott) Modified to clarify attachment description on 10/12/2021 (pb). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell S. Ponessa. (pb) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. for Stanley Black & Decker, Inc... (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Russell S. Ponessa (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2258876) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Ponessa, Russ) Modified to add receipt number on 9/10/2021 (pb). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. from Ward County District Court, case number 51-2021-CV-01463. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000961. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirsten Tuntland