This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2019 at 07:45:40 (UTC).

Bogues v. Bishop, Warden

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Bogues filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bishop, Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02035

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ericky Bogues

Cumberland, MD 21502

Defendants

Sgtc. Wedlock

L. Llewellyn, Nurse

Frank Bishop, Warden

Farris Hearing Officer

Larue, CO II

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION Request for Discovery by Ericky Bogues(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Verification of COMPLAINT against Frank Bishop, Warden, Farris Hearing Officer, Larue, CO II, L. Llewellyn, Nurse, Sgtc. Wedlock, filed by Ericky Bogues.(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Ericky Bogues (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing the Finance Officer at NBCI to File an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/18/2019. (c/m 7/19/19) (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Frank Bishop, Warden, Farris Hearing Officer, Larue, CO II, L. Llewellyn, Nurse, Sgtc. Wedlock, filed by Ericky Bogues. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION Request for Discovery by Ericky Bogues(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Verification of COMPLAINT against Frank Bishop, Warden, Farris Hearing Officer, Larue, CO II, L. Llewellyn, Nurse, Sgtc. Wedlock, filed by Ericky Bogues.(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ericky Bogues(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Ericky Bogues (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing the Finance Officer at NBCI to File an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/18/2019. (c/m 7/19/19) (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ericky Bogues(jb5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Frank Bishop, Warden, Farris Hearing Officer, Larue, CO II, L. Llewellyn, Nurse, Sgtc. Wedlock, filed by Ericky Bogues. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LaRue is a litigant