This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:15:49 (UTC).

BOGARDE v. SAUL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by BOGARDE against SAUL in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03841

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

JACOB P. HART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAMBI DEE BOGARDE

Defendant

ANDREW SAUL

Interested Party

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (va, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT SS CASE) (va, ). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

3 #1

CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT SS CASE

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/29/19. 8/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by BAMBI DEE BOGARDE. (va, ) (va, ). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, ) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/18.8/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (rf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Summons forwarded to the US Marshal Service on 8/29/19. 1 Summons to US Attorney on 8/29/19. (rf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/29/19. 8/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Social Security Magistrate Consent by BAMBI DEE BOGARDE.. (SUTTON, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (va, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT SS CASE) (va, ). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by BAMBI DEE BOGARDE. (va, ) (va, ). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by BAMBI DEE BOGARDE.(va, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.