This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:17:44 (UTC).

Boerigter v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Boerigter filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04184

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Boerigter

Defendant

Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek A. Nelsen

Attorney at Fuller, Williamson, Nelsen & Preheim, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Eric T. Preheim

Attorney at Fuller, Williamson, Nelsen & Preheim, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz

Attorney at Bangs McCullen Law Firm

6340 South Western Avenue #160, Po Box 88208

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/30/2019. (KLE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Stipulation and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company Unopposed. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#3) ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by John Boerigter. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

2 #2

AO 85

2 #1

Summons Issued

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3191775) filed by John Boerigter in shell case on 11/12/2019. (CLR) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/30/2019. (KLE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Stipulation and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company Unopposed. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by John Boerigter. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3191775) filed by John Boerigter in shell case on 11/12/2019. (CLR) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less