This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:38:34 (UTC).

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01573

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Streetp.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Streetp.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Megan Elizabeth Dellinger

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Streetp.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorney

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3736886.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: September 24, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: U.S. Patent No. 7,579,449 expires on 8/1/2028; U.S. Patent Nos. 10,258,637 and 11,090,323 expire on 4/3/2034. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: March 24, 2024. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,579,449 B2; 10,258,637 B2; 11,090,323 B2. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent C. H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. on 11/5/2021. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited on 11/5/2021. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various to See Stipulation - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. Reset Answer Deadlines: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited answer due 1/18/2022; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. answer due 1/18/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/30/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various to See Stipulation - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited on 11/5/2021. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. on 11/5/2021. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent C. H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,579,449 B2; 10,258,637 B2; 11,090,323 B2. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: September 24, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: U.S. Patent No. 7,579,449 expires on 8/1/2028; U.S. Patent Nos. 10,258,637 and 11,090,323 expire on 4/3/2034. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: March 24, 2024. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3736886.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Bilson