This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:18:12 (UTC).

Bodio v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Bodio filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03823

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Desiree Bodio

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey M. Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112

Alyssa Bernadette Baskam

Attorney at Beasley Allen Law Firm

10 Lenox Pointe

Atlanta, GA 30324

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP -MO

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112

Diane K. Watkins

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP -MO

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Brenton Webster Cole

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.-GA

Monarch Plaza, Suite 1600, 3414 Peachtree Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326-1164

Samuel Lanier Felker

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.-Nashville

Suite 800, 211 Commerce Street

Nashville, TN 37201

Lauren J.F. Barta

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP-MN

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3903

 

Court Documents

#12

Clerks Notation re #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Boston Scientific Corporation by Boston Scientific Corporation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#11

No Description Available

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Desiree Bodio. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 9/9/1919, answer due 9/30/1919. (Baskam, Alyssa) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#7

Clerks Notation re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation by Boston Scientific Corporation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenton Webster Cole on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Cole, Brenton) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Desiree Bodio. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Desiree Bodio. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8887257) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Diane K. Watkins as to Desiree Bodio regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Diane K. Watkins. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/21/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Diane K. Watkins Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Diane K. Watkins added appearing on behalf of Desiree Bodio (pmb) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Lauren J.F. Barta as to Boston Scientific Corporation regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren J. F. Barta. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/16/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren J. F. Barta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8991916). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Lauren J.F. Barta added appearing on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (pmb) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPLICATION for Admission of Diane K. Watkins Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Desiree Bodio. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baskam, Alyssa) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren J. F. Barta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8991916). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cole, Brenton) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Diane K. Watkins Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Boston Scientific Corporation by Boston Scientific Corporation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service Executed by Desiree Bodio. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 9/9/1919, answer due 9/30/1919. (Baskam, Alyssa) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation by Boston Scientific Corporation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Cole, Brenton) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Lanier Felker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8949002). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cole, Brenton) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenton Webster Cole on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Cole, Brenton) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Desiree Bodio. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Desiree Bodio. (Baskam, Alyssa) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Desiree Bodio. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8887257) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less