This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:26:18 (UTC).

Bock, LLC v. Steelman et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Bock, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Steelman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are George Foley, Jr, Jennifer A. Dorsey and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01065

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judges

George Foley, Jr

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernest Bock, LLC

Defendants

Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust

Trustee of Suzanne T. Steelman Irrevocable Trust

Maryann Steelman

Trustees of ABC Trusts

Trustee of Stephen P. Steelman Irrevocable Trust

Paul Steelman

Trustee of Paul C. Steelman and Maryann T. Steelman Revocable Living Trust

Suzanne Steelman Taylor

Stephen Steelman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Larson

Attorney at Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Ryan T. Gormley

Attorney at Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn , Dial

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

John Palladino

Attorney at Hankin Sandman Palladino Weintrob & Bell

30 S. New York Avenue

Atlantic City, NJ 08401

Evan Labov

Attorney at Hankin Sandman Palladino Weintrob & Bell

30 S New York Avenue

Atlantic City, NJ 08401

 

Court Documents

9 #5

Declaration

9 #4

Declaration

9 #3

Declaration

9 #2

Declaration

9 #1

Declaration

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernest Bock, LLC re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued,. Maryann Steelman(as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Maryann Steelman(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Paul Steelman(as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Paul Steelman(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Stephen Steelman served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Suzanne Steelman Taylor served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration)(Gormley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan M. Labov for Ernest Bock, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Larson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Palladino for Ernest Bock, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Larson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Evan M. Labov and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Larson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611404) by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Larson, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John F. Palladino and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Larson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611393) by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Larson, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Maryann Steelman (Individually and as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust), Paul Steelman (Individually and as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust), Stephen Steelman, and Suzanne Steelman Taylor re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5597349) by Ernest Bock, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gormley, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01065-JAD-EJY. (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernest Bock, LLC re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued,. Maryann Steelman(as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Maryann Steelman(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Paul Steelman(as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Paul Steelman(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Stephen Steelman served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Suzanne Steelman Taylor served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration)(Gormley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan M. Labov for Ernest Bock, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Larson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Palladino for Ernest Bock, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel David Larson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Evan M. Labov and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Larson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611404) by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Larson, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John F. Palladino and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Larson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611393) by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Larson, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Maryann Steelman (Individually and as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust), Paul Steelman (Individually and as Trustee of the Steelman Asset Protection Trust), Stephen Steelman, and Suzanne Steelman Taylor re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ernest Bock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Gormley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ernest Bock, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Tom Bock for Ernest Bock, LLC added. (Gormley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MR) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5597349) by Ernest Bock, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gormley, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.