This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2020 at 08:02:32 (UTC).

Bobe v. Cook et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Bobe filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cook. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet C. Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet C. Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcello Bobe

Hamden, CT 06514

Defendants

Debra Cruise

Rollin Cook

Gene Kaplan

Robert Richeson

Deborah Bradley

Jake

Jones

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Marcello Bobe (Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcello Bobe. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcello Bobe. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Deborah Bradley, Rollin Cook, Debra Cruise, Jake, Jones, Gene Kaplan, Robert Richeson, filed by Marcello Bobe.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Marcello Bobe (Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/12/20. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcello Bobe. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S. mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/17/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/25/20.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marcello Bobe. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcello Bobe. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Deborah Bradley, Rollin Cook, Debra Cruise, Jake, Jones, Gene Kaplan, Robert Richeson, filed by Marcello Bobe.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jake Dog LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JONES is a litigant