This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2020 at 12:56:28 (UTC).

Bobbitt v. Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services (DPSCS) et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Bobbitt filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services DPSCS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00648

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Bobbitt

Cumberland, MD 21502

Defendants

Captain Gordon

Bradley O. Butler

Officer Robey

Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services (DPSCS)

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) Correspondence regarding the status of Complaint for Emergency Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by George Bobbitt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT & MOTION for emergency injunctive relief against All Defendants, filed by George Bobbitt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jj2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jj2, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Correspondence regarding the status of Complaint for Emergency Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by George Bobbitt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT & MOTION for emergency injunctive relief against All Defendants, filed by George Bobbitt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jj2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jj2, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services (DPSCS) is a litigant