This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2020 at 10:51:16 (UTC).

Boatman v. Houzz Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Boatman filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Houzz Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James E. Shadid and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01217

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mike Boatman

Defendant

Houzz Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Benjamin Rothman

Attorney at SRIPLAW

Suite 100, 21301 Powerline Road

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Defendant Attorneys

John P Heil, Jr

Attorney at HEYL ROYSTER VOELKER & ALLEN

300 Hamilton Boulevard, Po Box 6199

Peoria, IL 61601-6199

Seth Andrew TeBeest

Attorney at HEYL ROYSTER VOELKER & ALLEN

300 Hamilton Boulevard, Po Box 6199

Peoria, IL 61601-6199

 

Court Documents

#8

1 #39

Exhibit 35 (part two)

1 #36

Exhibit 34 (part one)

1 #35

Exhibit 33

1 #34

Exhibit 32

1 #33

Exhibit 31

1 #32

Exhibit 30

1 #31

Exhibit 29

1 #20

Exhibit 20

1 #19

Exhibit 19

1 #18

Exhibit 18

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Houzz Inc.'s responsive pleading to the Complaint is due 9/7/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/6/20. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Defendant Houzz Inc.. Responses due by 8/19/2020 (TeBeest, Seth) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Seth Andrew TeBeest on behalf of Houzz Inc. (TeBeest, Seth) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John P Heil, Jr on behalf of Houzz Inc. (Heil, John) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mike Boatman. Houzz Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Mike Boatman. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. Copy of complaint and exhibits mailed to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Houzz Inc. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and for Deceptive Trade Practices (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Houzz Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3393723.), filed by Mike Boatman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 (part one), #27 Exhibit 26 (part two), #28 Exhibit 27 (part one), #29 Exhibit 27 (part two), #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34 (part one), #37 Exhibit 34 (part two), #38 Exhibit 35 (part one), #39 Exhibit 35 (part two), #40 Exhibit 36 (part one), #41 Exhibit 36 (part two), #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Civil Cover Sheet, #48 Proposed Summons)(Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Houzz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Benjamin Rothman