This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:48:22 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of The Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs v. GM General Contracting LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Boards of Trustees of The Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against GM General Contracting LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George C. Smith and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05345

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C. Smith

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of The Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs

Defendant

GM General Contracting LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Basil W Mangano

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co. LPA

2245 Warrensville Center Road, Suite 213

Cleveland, OH 44118

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to GM General Contracting LLC. (mdr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant GM General Contracting LLC. GM General Contracting LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (mdr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#3

(#3) Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GM General Contracting LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7230176), filed by Boards of Trustees of The Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant GM General Contracting LLC. GM General Contracting LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (mdr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to GM General Contracting LLC. (mdr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GM General Contracting LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7230176), filed by Boards of Trustees of The Ohio Laborers' Fringe Benefit Programs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.