This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 18:17:17 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Zone Safety LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Zone Safety LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Chelsey M. Vascura and James L. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02829

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

Presiding Judge

James L. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

Zone Safety LLC doing business as Zone Safety 365

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Defendant Attorneys

David Ryan Vance

Attorney at Zashin & Rich Co., LPA

950 Main Avenue, 4Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Ryan C. Spitzer

Attorney at Zashin & Rich Co., L.P.A.

17 S. High Street, Suite 900

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The July 28, 2021 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2021. Motions to Amend due by 11/12/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2021. Discovery (Fact) due by 2/25/2022. Dispositive motions due by 4/22/2022. Settlement Demand due by 3/1/2022. Mediation Deadline: 5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/22/2021. (daf) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#8

(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Zone Safety LLC served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (er) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Zone Safety LLC. (Vance, David) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 7/28/2021 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Zone Safety LLC. (Vance, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #2 Summons Issued. (eh) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Zone Safety LLC. (sem) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The July 28, 2021 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2021. Motions to Amend due by 11/12/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2021. Discovery (Fact) due by 2/25/2022. Dispositive motions due by 4/22/2022. Settlement Demand due by 3/1/2022. Mediation Deadline: 5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/22/2021. (daf) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Zone Safety LLC served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (er) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Zone Safety LLC. (Vance, David) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 7/28/2021 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Zone Safety LLC. (Vance, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #2 Summons Issued. (eh) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Zone Safety LLC. (sem) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zone Safety LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8334913), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Letter of Assent to CBA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore