Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 08:56:40 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04696

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC (daf) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC . (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC. The Defendant was served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (daf) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC. (daf) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648177), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC (daf) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC . (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC. The Defendant was served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (daf) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC. (daf) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Williams Flagger Logistics, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648177), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore