Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/28/2020 at 10:06:56 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. USA Concrete Specialists, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

USA Concrete Specialists, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Basil W Mangano

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co. LPA

2685 Fairmount Blvd., Suite 225

Cleveland, OH 44106

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. (er) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan K. Hymore

#5

(#5) Application to Clerk for entry of default against USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan K. Hymore) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant USA Concrete Specialists, Inc.: Served on 1/29/2020. Answer due 2/19/2020. (ew) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#3

(#3) Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to USA Concrete Specialists, Inc.. (bjc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7299098), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. (er) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Clerk for entry of default against USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan K. Hymore) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant USA Concrete Specialists, Inc.: Served on 1/29/2020. Answer due 2/19/2020. (ew) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to USA Concrete Specialists, Inc.. (bjc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against USA Concrete Specialists, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7299098), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Basil W Mangano