This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2022 at 07:51:45 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Rock River Construction Ltd

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Rock River Construction Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James L. Graham and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02806

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Graham

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

Rock River Construction Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices CO., LPA

4030 Smith Road, Suite 200

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rock River Construction Ltd ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8955885), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Rock River Construction Ltd. (ds) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed, but not signed as to Defendant Rock River Construction Ltd. USPS tracking deliver confirmation attached; reception area served on 7/18/2022. Answer due 8/8/2022. (vb) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#5

(#5) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Rock River Construction Ltd . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore

#6

(#6) Second Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Rock River Construction Ltd . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Second Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Rock River Construction Ltd . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Rock River Construction Ltd . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed, but not signed as to Defendant Rock River Construction Ltd. USPS tracking deliver confirmation attached; reception area served on 7/18/2022. Answer due 8/8/2022. (vb) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Rock River Construction Ltd. (ds) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rock River Construction Ltd ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8955885), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore