This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2020 at 08:17:19 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Nuko Paving Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Nuko Paving Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah D. Morrison and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02332

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah D. Morrison

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

Nuko Paving Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nuko Paving Inc. on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nuko Paving Inc. on May 8, 2020 by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. Waiver of Service due by 6/8/2020. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nuko Paving Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7458551), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nuko Paving Inc. on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nuko Paving Inc. on May 8, 2020 by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. Waiver of Service due by 6/8/2020. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nuko Paving Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7458551), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore