This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2019 at 07:39:43 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers and Sarah D. Morrison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02841

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judge

Sarah D. Morrison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendants

Matt Winters Excavation, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC

Matt Winters Excavating, LLC

Matt Winters Excavation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Louis Ball

4314 Donington Rd.

Columbus, OH 43220

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Matt Winters Excavation, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6992253), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#6

(#6) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC . (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 08/18/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Matt Winters Excavating, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (er) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN 14 DAYS of the date of this Order unless it has applied for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Show Cause Deadline is 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 12, 2019. (jlk) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Matt Winters Excavating, LLC. (sem) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #2

Summons Form

#10

(#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Plt's Motion to Accelerate and Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/22/2019. (sln) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#7

(#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Matt Winters Excavating, LLC. (er) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting #8 Plt's Motion to Accelerate and Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/22/2019. (sln) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Matt Winters Excavating, LLC. (er) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC . (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 08/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN 14 DAYS of the date of this Order unless it has applied for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Show Cause Deadline is 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 12, 2019. (jlk) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Matt Winters Excavating, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (er) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Matt Winters Excavating, LLC. (sem) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Matt Winters Excavation, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6992253), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Ball, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.