Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:42:51 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. M. Campbell Contracting LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against M Campbell Contracting LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05663

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

M. Campbell Contracting LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant M. Campbell Contracting LLC. The named defendant was served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (daf) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#3

(#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #2 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kl) Modified on 10/30/2020 (kl). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to M. Campbell Contracting LLC. (kl) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against M. Campbell Contracting LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732257), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant M. Campbell Contracting LLC. The named defendant was served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (daf) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #2 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kl) Modified on 10/30/2020 (kl). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to M. Campbell Contracting LLC. (kl) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against M. Campbell Contracting LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732257), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore