Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2020 at 08:24:24 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Chardon Concrete, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Chardon Concrete, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00614

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

Chardon Concrete, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Basil W Mangano

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co. LPA

2685 Fairmount Blvd., Suite 225

Cleveland, OH 44106

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Affidavit under R.C. 1701.07(H)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Chardon Concrete, Inc.. Chardon Concrete, Inc. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit under R.C. 1701.07(H)) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Chardon Concrete, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chardon Concrete, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7316572), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Chardon Concrete, Inc.. Chardon Concrete, Inc. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit under R.C. 1701.07(H)) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Chardon Concrete, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chardon Concrete, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7316572), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Basil W Mangano

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore