This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:03:06 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Atlas General Construction LLC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Atlas General Construction LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04695

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits

Defendant

Atlas General Construction LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) Certificate of Mailing: Regular mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bjc) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. and Complaint by Ordinary Mail under S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 4.2(c) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Atlas General Construction LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Atlas General Construction LLC. (kh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Atlas General Construction LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648155), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Mailing: Regular mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bjc) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. and Complaint by Ordinary Mail under S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 4.2(c) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Atlas General Construction LLC. (jlk) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Atlas General Construction LLC. (kh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Atlas General Construction LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648155), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore