This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2022 at 08:57:01 (UTC).

Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Railworks Track Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons Plasterers Health Welfare Trust filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Railworks Track Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01236

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust

Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust

Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust

Defendant

Railworks Track Systems Inc a foreign corporation, Contractor's License No. RAILWTS996BR, UBI No. 601206904 doing business as Railworks Track Systems LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Noelle E Dwarzski

Attorney at BARLOW COUGHRAN MORALES & JOSEPHSON PS

1325 Fourth Ave Ste 910

Seattle, WA 98101-2573

Defendant Attorneys

David M Pixley

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC (CLEVELAND)

6100 Oak Tree Blvd, Ste 400

Cleveland, OH 44131

Daniel P Crowner

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC (SEA)

520 Pike Street, Suite 2300

Seattle, WA 98101-4099

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Railworks Track Systems Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7688255) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust(pty:pla), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Railworks Track Systems Inc (JWC) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P Crowner on behalf of Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc. (Crowner, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David M. Pixley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7709366 (Crowner, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/5/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2022, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER entered at the direction of Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. The #7 Order Regarding FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report is VACATED. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#10

(#10) AMENDED MINUTE ORDER entered at the direction of Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. The following Orders are hereby VACATED: #3 Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and #7 Order Regarding FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2022. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#12

(#12) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File and Serve Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc. Noting Date 9/26/2022, (Crowner, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION. Defendant's Answeris now due by October 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#14

(#14) AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2022. (VE) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2022. (VE) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION. Defendant's Answeris now due by October 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File and Serve Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc. Noting Date 9/26/2022, (Crowner, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2022. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED MINUTE ORDER entered at the direction of Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. The following Orders are hereby VACATED: #3 Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and #7 Order Regarding FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER entered at the direction of Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. The #7 Order Regarding FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report is VACATED. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David M Pixley for Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to the case. (JWC) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/5/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2022, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David M. Pixley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7709366 (Crowner, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P Crowner on behalf of Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc. (Crowner, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/9/2022. (CDA) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Railworks Track Systems Inc (JWC) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (JWC) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Railworks Track Systems Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7688255) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust(pty:pla), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant