This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:47:07 (UTC).

BoardActive Corporation v. Foursquare Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 BoardActive Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Foursquare Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00597

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BoardActive Corporation

Defendant

Foursquare Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph J. Gribbin

Edward F. Behm

Defendant Attorney

Chad S.C. Stover

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US10,521,822 ;US10,621,620 ;US10,621,621 ;US10,685,380 ;US10,692,108. (srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Foursquare Labs, Inc. on 5/3/2022. (srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward Behm and Mark Halderman - filed by BoardActive Corporation. (Gribbin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by BoardActive Corporation. (Gribbin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BoardActive Corporation. Foursquare Labs, Inc. served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Gribbin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 30, 2022 - filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Chad S.C. Stover (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to July 14, 2022 - filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to July 14, 2022, filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Foursquare Labs, Inc. answer due 7/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/24/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to July 14, 2022 - filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Chad S.C. Stover (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Edward F. Behm for BoardActive Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 30, 2022 filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Foursquare Labs, Inc. answer due 6/30/2022. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/31/2022. (nmf) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 30, 2022 - filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward Behm and Mark Halderman filed by BoardActive Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/11/2022. (nmf) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BoardActive Corporation. Foursquare Labs, Inc. served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Gribbin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by BoardActive Corporation. (Gribbin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward Behm and Mark Halderman - filed by BoardActive Corporation. (Gribbin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Foursquare Labs, Inc. on 5/3/2022. (srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US10,521,822 ;US10,621,620 ;US10,621,621 ;US10,685,380 ;US10,692,108. (srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Foursquare Labs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3865439.) - filed by BoardActive Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less