This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2022 at 08:09:46 (UTC).

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund v. Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonie M. Brinkema and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01369

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund

Defendant

Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diana Migliaccio Bardes

Attorney at Mooney Green Saindon Murphy & Welch PC

1920 L Street, Nwsuite 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2022 re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. Appearance of Counsel for the Plaintiff. Matter uncontested. Motion taken under advisement. Report and Recommendation to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice of Hearing Date set for 2/4/2022 re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

8 #2

Affidavit of Diana M. Bardes

8 #1

Affidavit of Kenneth Anderson Jr.

#8

(#8) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Anderson Jr., #2 Affidavit of Diana M. Bardes)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. (swil) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

5 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#5) Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022 (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc., (swil) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8143156.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2022 re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. Appearance of Counsel for the Plaintiff. Matter uncontested. Motion taken under advisement. Report and Recommendation to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. (clar, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Hearing Date set for 2/4/2022 re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Anderson Jr., #2 Affidavit of Diana M. Bardes)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. (swil) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc. served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022 (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Raka General Sheet Metal, Inc., (swil) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8143156.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana Migliaccio Bardes