This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 08:16:28 (UTC).

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund v. Hayden Construction & Service Company

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hayden Construction Service Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T. S. Ellis, III and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01341

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund

Defendant

Hayden Construction & Service Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diana Migliaccio Bardes

Attorney at Mooney Green Saindon Murphy & Welch PC

1920 L Street, Nwsuite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Connor Deacon

Attorney at Conn Maciel Carey LLP

5335 Wisconsin Ave Nwsuite 660

Washington, DC 20015

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8129877.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hayden Construction & Service Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

3 #1

Notice

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Hayden Construction & Service Company served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021 (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Connor Deacon on behalf of Hayden Construction & Service Company (Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hayden Construction & Service Company. (Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hayden Construction & Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Defendant's time to file a responsive pleading is extended to January 26, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/27/2021. (kgall) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Hayden Construction & Service Company.(Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Hayden Construction & Service Company.(Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Defendant's time to file a responsive pleading is extended to January 26, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/27/2021. (kgall) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hayden Construction & Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hayden Construction & Service Company. (Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Connor Deacon on behalf of Hayden Construction & Service Company (Deacon, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund Hayden Construction & Service Company served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021 (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hayden Construction & Service Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (shea) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8129877.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant