This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 08:08:59 (UTC).

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund et al v. Fisher Test & Balance, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Fisher Test Balance, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00562

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund

Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry

Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund

Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust

National Energy Management Institute Committee

Defendant

Fisher Test & Balance, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diana Migliaccio Bardes

Attorney at Mooney Green Saindon Murphy & Welch PC

1920 L Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8393613.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Committee. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Fisher Test & Balance, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

3 #1

Notice

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee Fisher Test & Balance, Inc. served on 6/29/2022, answer due 7/20/2022 (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee Fisher Test & Balance, Inc. served on 6/29/2022, answer due 7/20/2022 (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Fisher Test & Balance, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, National Energy Management Institute Committee. (Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8393613.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bardes, Diana) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana Migliaccio Bardes