This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:36:46 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund v. Show Ready, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Show Ready, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND

Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund

Defendants

SHOW READY, LLC, a suspended California limited liability company

Show Ready, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marie J Skinner

Attorney at Wohlner Kaplon Cutler Halford and Rosenfeld APC

16501 Ventura Boulevard Suite 304

Encino, CA 91436

Elizabeth Rosenfeld

Attorney at Wohlner Kaplon Cutler Halford and Rosenfeld

16501 Ventura Boulevard Suite 304

Encino, CA 91436

Kathryn Jane Halford

Attorney at Wohlner Kaplon Cutler Halford and Rosenfeld

16501 Ventura Boulevard Suite 304

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Show Ready, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND, (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund, upon Defendant Show Ready, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Doe, Who Refused to Give Name, Manager, Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25065271 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Marie J Skinner added to party BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND(pty:pla))(Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Miscellaneous Security Trust Fund, upon Defendant Show Ready, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Doe, Who Refused to Give Name, Manager, Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Show Ready, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND, (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25065271 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Marie J Skinner added to party BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND in their capacity as fiduciaries for the TEAMSTERS MISCELLANEOUS SECURITY TRUST FUND(pty:pla))(Skinner, Marie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less