This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2020 at 08:00:23 (UTC).

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND v. ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02083

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND

669 River Drive, Suite 125, 669 River Drive, Suite 125

Elmwood Park, NJ 07407

Defendants

ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC.

820 Bear Tavern Road, West Trenton, Nj 08628, 469 Old Trenton Road

East Windsor, NJ 08512

ABC COMPANY (a fictitious Corporation)

DEF COMPANY (a fictitious Limited Liability Company)

GHI COMPANY (a fictitious Partnership)

JKL (a fictitious business entity)

JKL

DEF COMPANY

ABC COMPANY

GHI COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL ALLEN MONTALBANO

Attorney at COHEN, LEDER, MOTALBANO & CONNAUGHTON, LLC

River Drive Center Ii, 669 River Drive, Suite 125

Elmwood Park, NJ 07407

Defendant Attorney

RUDOLPH J. BURSHNIC

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540-6289

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT ORDER extending the deadline to respond to the Complaint from April 20, 2020 to May 20, 2020, therefore that Elementis will have up to and including May 20, 2020, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 04/16/2020. (jdb) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER - Defendant Elementis Specialties, Inc. is to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by April 20, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RUDOLPH J. BURSHNIC on behalf of ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC. (BURSHNIC, RUDOLPH) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS & COMPLAINT served on PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE on 2/28/2020, filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND. (MONTALBANO, PAUL) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND. (MONTALBANO, PAUL) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10461185), filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE TEAMSTERS INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND.(MONTALBANO, PAUL) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JKL, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GHI CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant