This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 09:50:01 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund v. Tope et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Tope. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01323

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund

Defendants

Cynthia A Tope

Holladay, UT 84124

Pamela J Tope

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wesley J Smith

Attorney at Christensen James & Martin

7440 W. Sahara Ave.

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Daryl E Martin

Attorney at Christensen James & Martin

7440 W. Sahara Ave.

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, addressed to Cynthia A. Tope. RTS, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (HAM) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to add the last known address of Cynthia A. Tope to the civil docket and send a copy of this Order to: ATTN: Cynthia A. Tope, Delmonico Apartments, 4370 S. Highland Dr., Holladay, UT 84124. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/13/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc mailed to Cynthia Tope - HAM) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Service by Publication with Proposed Order by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. (Martin, Daryl) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Pamela J Tope on 7/22/2021 executed by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. (Martin, Daryl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cynthia A Tope, Pamela J Tope re #1 Complaint (HAM) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Daryl) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cynthia A Tope, Pamela J Tope (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6556136) by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Martin, Daryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, addressed to Cynthia A. Tope. RTS, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (HAM) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to add the last known address of Cynthia A. Tope to the civil docket and send a copy of this Order to: ATTN: Cynthia A. Tope, Delmonico Apartments, 4370 S. Highland Dr., Holladay, UT 84124. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/13/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc mailed to Cynthia Tope - HAM) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Service by Publication with Proposed Order by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. (Martin, Daryl) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Pamela J Tope on 7/22/2021 executed by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. (Martin, Daryl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cynthia A Tope, Pamela J Tope re #1 Complaint (HAM) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Daryl) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cynthia A Tope, Pamela J Tope (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6556136) by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund. Proof of service due by 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Martin, Daryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daryl E Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley J Smith