This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2019 at 07:09:55 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada et al v. Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05539

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund

Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund

Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada

International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan

Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401 k Plan

Defendants

Mechanical Test and Balance, Inc.

Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada Corporation

Frank Arone

DOES 1 to 10

Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada, LLC.

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Michael O'Donnell

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Laurie A Traktman

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2732

Steven M Rehaut

Attorney at Gilbert & Sackman

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Frank Arone, Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada Corporation, Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada, LLC., Mechanical Test and Balance, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#10

(#10) DECLARATION of Benjamin M. ODonnell as Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401 k Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401 k Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23983096 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund. (Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan(pty:pla))(O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Frank Arone, Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada Corporation, Mechanical Test and Balance of Nevada, LLC., Mechanical Test and Balance, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLARATION of Benjamin M. ODonnell as Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401 k Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401 k Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan. (O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23983096 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund. (Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Industry Stabilization Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Section 401(k) Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Unified Construction Industry Council Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern Nevada Industry Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 88 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael O'Donnell added to party International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 88 Union Dues Check-Off and Vacation Plan(pty:pla))(O'Donnell, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers' Local 359 is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael O'Donnell