This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 07:10:24 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund filed an Other lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and M. James Lorenz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00345

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

M. James Lorenz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund

Defendant

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk Dwight Dillman

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie G. Wheeler

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10011

Jacob M. Croke

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

William T. Davison

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert J. Giuffra, Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Cole A. Goodman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

William N Kammer

Attorney at Solomon, Ward, Seidenwurm & Smith, LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Hilary M. Williams

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Mary E. Brust

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Amy D. Roy

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/22/2021. (jpp) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#28

(#28) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Kammer, William) (jpp). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#27

(#27) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, , from Defendant Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2.f.4: lacking signature certification. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by MDS, Law Clerk for Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/21/2021.(mme) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#26

(#26) *STRICKEN PER ECF #27*Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Kammer, William) (mme). (Main Document 26 replaced on 4/21/2021) (mme). Modified on 4/21/2021 to reflect document striken (mme). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#25

(#25) REPLY - Other re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Kammer, William) (mme). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#21

(#21) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15606527.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Davison, William) (rmc). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#15

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#9

(#9) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15557186.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Giuffra, Robert) (rmc). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC.. (Kammer, William) (jpp). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to on or before 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/21/2021. (jpp) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC served. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/22/2021. (jpp) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Kammer, William) (jpp). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, , from Defendant Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2.f.4: lacking signature certification. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by MDS, Law Clerk for Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/21/2021.(mme) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) *STRICKEN PER ECF #27*Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Kammer, William) (mme). (Main Document 26 replaced on 4/21/2021) (mme). Modified on 4/21/2021 to reflect document striken (mme). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY - Other re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Kammer, William) (mme). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#22) PRO HAC APPROVED: Amy D. Roy, Cole A. Goodman, Mary E. Brust, Robert A. Skinner, William T. Davison appearing for Defendant Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15606527.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Davison, William) (rmc). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15606510.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Skinner, Robert) (rmc). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15557229.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wheeler, Stephanie) (rmc). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15557186.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Giuffra, Robert) (rmc). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC.. (Kammer, William) (jpp). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to on or before 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/21/2021. (jpp) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC served. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Dillman, Kirk) (jpp). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15442083.), filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego County Construction Laborers' Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-345-L-AHG. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Dillman, Kirk)(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirk Dillman